Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christian Rodembourg, M.S.A.

Bishop-Elect of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1956 Born
12 May 199134.7First VowsMember of Clerical Society of the Missionaries of the Holy Apostles
29 May 199437.7ProfessedMember of Clerical Society of the Missionaries of the Holy Apostles
5 Aug 199538.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerical Society of the Missionaries of the Holy Apostles
29 Jun 201760.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
17 Sep 201761.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Christian Rodembourg (VIAF: 229381244)
Father Christian Rodembourg M.S.A. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrussels, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Ordained PriestMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 5 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017