Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Ferdinand Guy Boulanger

Bishop-Elect of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada

Titular See: (consecration postponed)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1963 Born
26 Oct 199128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
31 Jan 202056.6AppointedBishop of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada
21 Mar 202056.7InstalledBishop of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ferdinand Guy Boulanger
Father Joseph Ferdinand Guy Boulanger (born ) Bishop-Elect of Rouyn-Noranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Cécile de Whitton, Archdiocese of Sherbrooke, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph, Cathedral, Rouyn-Noranda, Diocese of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Rouyn-Noranda.

  • a priest for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 4 Feb 2020
  • c2+: CB, 18 Feb 2020
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast