Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Fitzpatrick Russell

Apostolic Nuncio to Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Novi

Apostolic Nuncio to Turkmenistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1959 Born
31 Jan 198727.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
20 Jun 198728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
19 Mar 201656.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Turkey
19 Mar 201656.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novi
19 Mar 201656.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Turkmenistan
3 Jun 201657.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novi

MicroData Summary for Paul Fitzpatrick Russell
Archbishop Paul Fitzpatrick Russell (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Turkey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreenfield

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Turkey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2016
  • od/c01: CB, 22 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 6 Apr 2016
  • c2: CB, 17 Apr 2016
  • c34: CB, 26 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,930

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jan 2017