Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imrich I. Esterházy de Galántha

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1689¹BornGenova
23 Jul 172536.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
7 Dec 174051.9SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
29 May 174152.4ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
29 Nov 176374.9DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Imrich I. Esterházy de Galántha:
Bishop Imrich I. Esterházy de Galántha (born 1689, died ) Bishop of Nitra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015