Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Grasse

Deceased

Bishop of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1720BornSongeons
24 Aug 175433.9SelectedBishop of Vence, France
17 Feb 175534.3ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
23 Mar 175534.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
20 Jan 175938.3ResignedBishop of Vence, France
4 Apr 175938.5AppointedBishop of Angers, France
24 Jul 178261.8DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Grasse: VIAF:89571250
Bishop Jacques de Grasse (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 83, and Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015