Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Pappalardo

Archbishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1945 BornNicolosi
30 Jun 196823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
5 Feb 199852.8AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
5 Mar 199852.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
12 Sep 200863.4AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Pappalardo:
Archbishop Salvatore Pappalardo (born ) Archbishop of Siracusa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Siracusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015