Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Sciacca

Official of the Apostolic Signatura

Titular Bishop of Fundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1955 BornCatania, Italy
7 Oct 197823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
3 Sep 201156.5AppointedSecretary of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
3 Sep 201156.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Victoriana
8 Oct 201156.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Victoriana
10 Nov 201257.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fundi
24 Aug 201358.5AppointedOfficial of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sciacca:
Bishop Giuseppe Sciacca (born ) Official of Apostolic Signatura

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Signatura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2011
  • ob: CB, 10 Sep 2011
  • c2+: CB, 17 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,174
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2012, Number 21
  • b: CB, 3 Dec 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013