Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanley Girard Schlarman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dodge City, Kansas, USA


Motto: Who Is a Rock But Our Lord


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1933Born
13 Jul 195824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Belleville, Illinois, USA
13 Mar 197945.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
13 Mar 197945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Capreae
14 May 197945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capreae
1 Mar 198349.5AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
4 May 198349.7InstalledBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
12 May 199864.7ResignedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
28 Apr 202591.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Dodge City, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary
Stanley Girard Schlarman
Bishop Stanley Girard Schlarman
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Dodge City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelleville, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois
Ordained PriestSan Alessio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Belleville, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois
Death PlaceBrightly Senior Living, Mascoutah, IL, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois
Buried Place (Original)Green Mount Catholic, Cemetery, Belleville, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,906
  • op.loc: CB, 27 Oct 2022
  • d: CB, 29 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025