Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nicomedes Grossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1915Born
21 Sep 194025.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 196246.9AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
25 Jan 196347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
15 Mar 199074.5RetiredBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
21 Jun 200993.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Nicomedes Grossi
Bishop José Nicomedes Grossi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus da Lapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCipotânea

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast