Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo das Mercés de Oliveira Pena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valença, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1890BornCongonhas do Campo
14 Apr 191423.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 193544.7AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
8 Sep 193544.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
3 Jan 194251.2AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 Dec 196070.2ResignedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 Feb 196271.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonis
14 Dec 197080.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Apollonis
24 Jan 197584.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo das Mercés de Oliveira Pena:
Bishop Rodolfo das Mercés de Oliveira Pena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valença

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015