Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Six, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Léopoldville

Titular Bishop of Baliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1887BornVlamartingue, Belgium
20 Jul 191527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Feb 193446.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Feb 193446.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
14 May 193446.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
24 Nov 195265.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Georges Six:
Bishop Georges Six C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Léopoldville

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015