Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Félix de Hemptinne, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Katanga

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1876BornGand, Belgium
21 Mar 189720.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Aug 190124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Aug 191033.7AppointedPrefect of Katanga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Mar 193255.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
15 Mar 193255.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Katanga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jul 193255.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
6 Feb 195881.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Katanga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Félix de Hemptinne:
Bishop Jean-Félix de Hemptinne O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Katanga

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013