Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Joseph Matthysen (Matthijsen), M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1890BornHoogboom-Eeckeren, Belgium
8 Sep 191524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
21 Jun 192231.6AppointedPrefect of Lac Albert, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Dec 193343.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Berenice
11 Dec 193343.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lac Albert, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Feb 193443.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berenice
10 Nov 195969.0AppointedBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Aug 196372.7DiedBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Joseph Matthysen (Matthijsen):
Bishop Alphonse Joseph Matthysen (Matthijsen) M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop of Bunia

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013