Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard van Goethem, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Coquilhatville

Titular Bishop of Corone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1873BornBeveren Waes, Belgium
23 Dec 189926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
25 Feb 192451.0AppointedPrefect of Tsuapa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Nov 193259.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corone
29 Nov 193259.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Apr 193360.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corone
10 Apr 194774.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 May 194976.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Coquilhatville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Edouard van Goethem:
Bishop Edouard van Goethem M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Coquilhatville

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013