Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond W. Field

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Árd Mór


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1944 Born
17 May 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
28 May 199753.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
28 May 199753.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Mór
21 Sep 199753.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Mór
27 Jun 201975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Raymond W. Field
Bishop Raymond W. Field (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopSaint Andrew, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Dublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,146
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast