Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Moriarty

Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1936 Born
21 May 196124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
26 Jun 199154.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
26 Jun 199154.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
22 Sep 199155.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia
4 Jun 200265.8AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
31 Aug 200266.0InstalledBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
22 Apr 201073.6ResignedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Moriarty
Bishop James Moriarty (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,471
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast