Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eamonn Oliver Walsh

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Elmhama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1944 Born
13 Apr 196924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
7 Mar 199045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
7 Mar 199045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elmhama
22 Apr 199045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elmhama
30 Sep 201975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eamonn Oliver Walsh
Bishop Eamonn Oliver Walsh (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelbridge
Ordained BishopSaint André, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Dublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,786
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast