Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Drennan

Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1944 Born
16 Jul 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
28 May 199753.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
28 May 199753.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
21 Sep 199753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
23 May 200561.3AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
29 Jul 201672.5ResignedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Martin Drennan
Bishop Martin Drennan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiltown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,145
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast