Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand-Anne-Tristan de La Baume de Suze

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹BornDauphiné
166929.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 167535.6SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
30 Aug 167737.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
10 Oct 167737.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Oct 167737.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
31 May 168444.4SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
4 Feb 169252.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
4 Mar 170565.1DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Armand-Anne-Tristan de La Baume de Suze:
Archbishop Armand-Anne-Tristan de La Baume de Suze (born 1640, died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 108, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015