Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Mariano Alguacil y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1805BornCórdoba
11 May 182823.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185853.7AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Mar 185954.0Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
2 Dec 186156.7SelectedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
23 Dec 186156.7ConfirmedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
6 Nov 187671.6SelectedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
18 Dec 187671.7ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
10 Jan 188478.8DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Diego Mariano Alguacil y Rodríguez:
Bishop Diego Mariano Alguacil y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 186, and Page 433
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 590
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 167, Number 919

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013