Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregoria María López y Zaragoza

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1805BornVillacañas
13 Jun 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 186358.6SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
21 Dec 186358.7ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
13 Mar 186458.9Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 May 186964.0DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregoria María López y Zaragoza:
Bishop Gregoria María López y Zaragoza (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 171, Number 940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013