Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Laborda Clau

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1783BornBarbuñales
19 Dec 180724.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 183148.1SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
24 Feb 183248.3ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
3 Jun 183248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
11 Feb 185369.3DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Laborda Clau:
Bishop Carlos Laborda Clau (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 148, Number 809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013