Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Lucas Asensio Poves

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1807BornVillar del Saz
23 Oct 185750.0SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Dec 185750.2ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
11 Apr 185850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
18 Nov 187063.1DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Lucas Asensio Poves:
Bishop Pedro Lucas Asensio Poves (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 165, Number 909

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013