Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Sales Crespo y Bautista

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1812BornToledo
1836¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
23 Dec 186149.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
23 Dec 186149.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
30 Mar 186250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
8 Jun 187563.4SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
5 Jul 187563.4ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
6 Feb 187765.0DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Sales Crespo y Bautista:
Bishop Francisco de Sales Crespo y Bautista (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 117, and Page 386
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 928

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013