Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Pullen Hardman, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1909BornBolton, Great Britain
12 Mar 193828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
15 May 195242.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zomba, Malawi
15 May 195242.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Attanasus
7 Sep 195242.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attanasus
25 Apr 195949.4AppointedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
21 Sep 197060.8ResignedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
21 Sep 197060.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
6 Apr 197161.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
24 Mar 199686.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Zomba, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Pullen Hardman:
Bishop Lawrence Pullen Hardman S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zomba

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013