Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Massa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Rio Negro, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1880BornCornigliano, Italy
15 Jan 190524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Jul 192545.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
5 Apr 194160.7AppointedPrelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
5 Apr 194160.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
1 May 194160.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
1 Oct 194666.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
13 Jun 196786.9RetiredPrelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Sep 196888.2DiedPrelate Emeritus of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Massa:
Bishop Pedro Massa S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Rio Negro

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015