Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Beaumont d’Autichamp

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690BornValentinen
17 Apr 174151.3AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
11 Jun 174151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
20 Nov 176171.9DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for François de Beaumont d’Autichamp:
Bishop François de Beaumont d’Autichamp (died ) Bishop of Tulle

  • a bishop for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013