Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco do Borja Pereira do Amaral

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1898BornCampinas
15 Aug 192223.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 194042.2AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Feb 194142.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Oct 194446.0AppointedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 May 197677.6RetiredBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 May 198990.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco do Borja Pereira do Amaral:
Bishop Francisco do Borja Pereira do Amaral (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013