Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Delfim Ribeiro Guedes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1908Born
25 Oct 193123.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 194335.1AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Oct 194335.4Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Jul 196052.2AppointedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Dec 198375.5ResignedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Feb 198576.8DiedBishop Emeritus of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Delfim Ribeiro Guedes
Bishop Delfim Ribeiro Guedes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaria da Fé

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast