Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivo Muser

Bishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1962 BornBrunico
28 Jun 198725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
27 Jul 201149.4AppointedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
9 Oct 201149.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ivo Muser:
Bishop Ivo Muser (born ) Bishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Aug 2011
  • c23: CB, 9 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013