Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Cesarini (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592²BornRome
30 Aug 162735.6Elevated to Cardinal
6 Oct 162735.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
6 Sep 163240.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
14 May 163644.3AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
25 May 163644.3Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
9 Feb 163745.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
28 Jul 163846.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
13 Sep 163846.6ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
25 Jan 164452.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Cesarini (Jr.):
Alessandro Cardinal Cesarini (Jr.) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
  • a cardinal for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 21, and Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 583
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015