Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Perrone

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornRossano
11 Apr 163938.3AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
25 Apr 163938.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
16 Nov 1677³76.9DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Perrone:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Perrone (died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 256
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 623

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013