Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benigo Perilla y Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Tunja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1831Born
15 Aug 185322.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 185322.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 188755.8AppointedBishop of Tunja, Colombia
28 Aug 188756.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tunja, Colombia
13 Mar 190371.8DiedBishop of Tunja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Benigo Perilla y Martínez
Bishop José Benigo Perilla y Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Tunja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomondoco, Diocese of Tunja
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 572
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017