Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikol Joseph Cauchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gozo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1929BornGharb
29 Mar 195223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
24 Feb 196737.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gozo, Malta
24 Feb 196737.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
9 Apr 196738.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
20 Jul 197243.3AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
10 Sep 197243.5InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
26 Nov 200576.7RetiredBishop of Gozo, Malta
15 Nov 201081.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Nikol Joseph Cauchi:
Bishop Nikol Joseph Cauchi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gozo

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2005
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 11 Jul 2015