Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Nicolosi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1922BornPedara
22 Oct 194422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
21 Mar 196341.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
21 Apr 196341.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
27 Jun 197048.4AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
19 Jun 199876.3RetiredBishop of Noto, Italy
10 Jan 201491.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Nicolosi:
Bishop Salvatore Nicolosi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Noto

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: CB, 10 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014