Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annetto Depasquale

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Aradi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1938Born
7 Apr 196223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
16 Nov 199860.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
16 Nov 199860.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
2 Jan 199960.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi
29 Nov 201173.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Annetto Depasquale
Bishop Annetto Depasquale (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQormi

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,453
  • op/c1: Website of the Diocese
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast