Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ricceri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1903BornBiancavilla
18 Sep 192623.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 195753.9AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
16 Mar 195753.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coela
28 Apr 195754.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coela
15 May 196158.0AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
31 Jul 197875.2RetiredBishop of Trapani, Italy
28 Jul 198077.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ricceri:
Bishop Francesco Ricceri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trapani

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015