Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathieu Madega Lebouankehan

Bishop of Mouila

Apostolic Administrator of Port-Gentil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1960 BornMbigou
29 Dec 199131.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 200039.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Libreville, Gabon
17 Feb 200039.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
7 May 200039.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
19 Mar 200342.7AppointedBishop of Port-Gentil, Gabon
19 Jan 201352.5AppointedBishop of Mouila, Gabon
19 Jan 201352.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Port-Gentil, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Mathieu Madega Lebouankehan:
Bishop Mathieu Madega Lebouankehan (born ) Bishop of Mouila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mouila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,758
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014