Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Mario Virgilio Atzei, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1942 BornMantova
17 Sep 195917.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Oct 196321.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
18 Dec 196624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Feb 199350.9AppointedBishop of Tempio-Ampurias, Italy
28 Mar 199351.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tempio-Ampurias, Italy
14 Sep 200462.5AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
31 Oct 200462.6InstalledArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Mario Virgilio Atzei:
Archbishop Paolo Mario Virgilio Atzei O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop of Sassari

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sassari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015