Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Vincent Ondo Eyene

Bishop of Oyem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1960 BornKoulamoutou
1 Jul 199030.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 200040.1AppointedBishop of Oyem, Gabon
7 May 200040.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oyem, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Vincent Ondo Eyene:
Bishop Jean-Vincent Ondo Eyene (born ) Bishop of Oyem

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oyem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014