Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Armidale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1848Born
18 Sep 187526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Jan 190354.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Armidale, Australia
12 Jan 190354.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
3 May 190354.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
28 Jan 190455.0SucceededBishop of Armidale, Australia
15 Jul 193283.5DiedBishop of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph O’Connor
Bishop Patrick Joseph O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Armidale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilgobinet, Ireland

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 524
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast