Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Hayden

Deceased

Archbishop of Hobart, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1867Born
28 Oct 189124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
13 Mar 191850.9AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
8 Sep 191851.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
11 Feb 193062.9AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
2 Oct 193669.5DiedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Hayden
Archbishop William Hayden (born , died ) Archbishop of Hobart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBishop’s Lough, Ireland

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast