Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Whyte

Deceased

Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand


from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1868Born
3 Jul 189223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
22 Apr 192051.4AppointedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
12 Dec 192052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
26 Dec 195789.1DiedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for James Whyte
Bishop James Whyte (born , died ) Bishop of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny, Ireland

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast