Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Magnus Henrique Lopes, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Salgueiro, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1965 BornAçu
6 Jan 198923.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Dec 199631.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Jun 201044.8AppointedBishop of Salgueiro, Pernambuco, Brazil
17 Sep 201045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salgueiro, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Magnus Henrique Lopes
Bishop Magnus Henrique Lopes O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Salgueiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salgueiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016