Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João José da Costa, O. Carm.

Archbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1958 Born
19 Jan 198627.5ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
12 Dec 199234.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
7 Jan 200950.5AppointedBishop of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil
19 Mar 200950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil
5 Nov 201456.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
18 Jan 201758.5SucceededArchbishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João José da Costa
Archbishop João José da Costa O. Carm. (born ) Archbishop of Aracajú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagarto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Aracajú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,067
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2014
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jan 2017