Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Ciocca Vasino

Prelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1949 Born
8 Sep 197425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
3 Mar 199949.6AppointedBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
2 May 199949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
21 Mar 201262.7AppointedPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil
13 May 201262.8InstalledPrelate of São Félix, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adriano Ciocca Vasino
Bishop Adriano Ciocca Vasino (born ) Prelate of São Félix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorgosesia

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of São Félix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,509
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2012
  • i: CB, 3 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast