Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caruaru, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1917BornSão José do Belmonte
8 Dec 194326.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 195942.2AppointedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
25 Oct 195942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Oct 199376.4RetiredBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
8 Aug 199780.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augusto Carvalho:
Bishop Augusto Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caruaru

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013