Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mogale Paul Nkhumishe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Polokwane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1938BornWarmbaths
24 Jun 196729.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 198143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lydenburg-Witbank, South Africa
5 Nov 198143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
14 Feb 198244.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
9 Jan 198445.9AppointedBishop of Lydenburg-Witbank, South Africa
31 May 198446.3InstalledBishop of Lydenburg-Witbank, South Africa
17 Feb 200062.0AppointedBishop of Pietersburg, South Africa
9 Dec 201173.8ResignedBishop of Polokwane, South Africa
29 Jun 201274.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Polokwane, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Mogale Paul Nkhumishe:
Bishop Mogale Paul Nkhumishe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Polokwane

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • N: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2011
  • d: CB, 30 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013