Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Durkin, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tzaneen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1913BornAscare, Ireland
19 Jul 193724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 Feb 196350.0AppointedPrefect of Louis Trichardt, South Africa
16 Nov 197259.7AppointedBishop of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen, South Africa
4 Mar 197360.0Ordained BishopBishop of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen, South Africa
22 Jun 198471.3ResignedBishop of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen, South Africa
27 Sep 199077.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tzaneen, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Durkin:
Bishop John Thomas Durkin M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tzaneen

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015