Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Gabriel Risi, O.M.I.

Bishop of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1949 Born
12 Jul 197425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 Jul 200051.4AppointedBishop of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa
14 Oct 200051.7Ordained BishopBishop of Keimoes-Upington, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Edward Gabriel Risi
Bishop Edward Gabriel Risi O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Keimoes-Upington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJohannesburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Keimoes-Upington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast